Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 1 | $526,130 |
Sells | 42 | $40,812,003 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
15 Nov 2023 15:20 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | MONTAGNER MARC | Director | 14 Nov 2023 | Sale | 10,550 | 65.8311 | 694,518 | D |
16 Nov 2023 16:27 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | SCHAEFFER DAVE | CHAIRMAN, CEO, AND PRESIDENT, 10% | 14 Nov 2023 | Sale | 40,000 | 66.37 | 2,654,800 | D |
17 Nov 2023 11:37 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | BATH BLAKE | Director | 16 Nov 2023 | Sale | 379 | 67 | 25,393 | D |
17 Nov 2023 16:59 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | BATH BLAKE | Director | 17 Nov 2023 | Sale | 8,621 | 67.1653 | 579,032 | D |
21 Nov 2023 11:01 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | BATH BLAKE | Director | 20 Nov 2023 | Sale | 9,000 | 67.139 | 604,251 | D |
27 Nov 2023 16:30 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | KENNEDY SHERYL LYNN | Director | 27 Nov 2023 | Sale | 925 | 65.7736 | 60,841 | D |
30 Nov 2023 15:04 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | FERGUSON LEWIS H | Director | 30 Nov 2023 | Sale | 950 | 64.595 | 61,365 | D |
01 Dec 2023 09:41 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | SCHAEFFER DAVE | CHAIRMAN, CEO, AND PRESIDENT, 10% | 30 Nov 2023 | Sale | 3,396 | 64.3136 | 218,409 | D |
01 Dec 2023 16:47 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | SCHAEFFER DAVE | CHAIRMAN, CEO, AND PRESIDENT, 10% | 01 Dec 2023 | Sale | 36,604 | 65.1757 | 2,385,691 | D |
04 Dec 2023 11:59 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | WEED THADDEUS GERARD | VICE PRESIDENT, CFO | 04 Dec 2023 | Sale | 9,700 | 65.8398 | 638,646 | D |
04 Dec 2023 13:46 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | BUBECK JAMES | CHIEF REVENUE OFFICER | 01 Dec 2023 | Sale | 1,920 | 63.6963 | 122,297 | D |
06 Dec 2023 13:49 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | BUBECK JAMES | CHIEF REVENUE OFFICER | 05 Dec 2023 | Sale | 1,920 | 66.1236 | 126,957 | D |
08 Dec 2023 15:56 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | KILMER HENRY W | VP OF NETWORK STRATEGY | 07 Dec 2023 | Sale | 4,800 | 67.9441 | 326,132 | D |
14 Dec 2023 10:14 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | SCHAEFFER DAVE | CHAIRMAN, CEO, AND PRESIDENT, 10% | 13 Dec 2023 | Sale | 20,000 | 69.99 | 1,399,800 | D |
15 Dec 2023 10:23 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | CHANG JOHN B. | VP & CHIEF LEGAL OFFICER | 14 Dec 2023 | Sale | 500 | 72 | 36,000 | D |
22 Dec 2023 16:26 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | CHANG JOHN B. | VP & CHIEF LEGAL OFFICER | 21 Dec 2023 | Sale | 1,000 | 74 | 74,000 | D |
28 Dec 2023 09:37 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | CHANG JOHN B. | VP & CHIEF LEGAL OFFICER | 26 Dec 2023 | Sale | 3,550 | 76 | 269,800 | D |
04 Mar 2024 17:29 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | BUBECK JAMES | CHIEF REVENUE OFFICER | 01 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,920 | 76.6186 | 147,108 | D |
06 Mar 2024 09:38 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | KILMER HENRY W | VP OF NETWORK STRATEGY | 05 Mar 2024 | Sale | 2,400 | 73.4746 | 176,339 | D |
08 Mar 2024 12:00 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | SCHAEFFER DAVE | CHAIRMAN, CEO, AND PRESIDENT, 10% | 06 Mar 2024 | Sale | 8,826 | 72.55 | 640,326 | D |
14 Mar 2024 10:53 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | SCHAEFFER DAVE | CHAIRMAN, CEO, AND PRESIDENT, 10% | 11 Mar 2024 | Sale A | 35,000 | 67.93 | 2,377,550 | D |
14 Mar 2024 10:58 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | SCHAEFFER DAVE | CHAIRMAN, CEO, AND PRESIDENT, 10% | 12 Mar 2024 | Sale A | 50,000 | 68.12 | 3,406,000 | D |
14 Mar 2024 11:03 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | WEED THADDEUS GERARD | VICE PRESIDENT, CFO | 12 Mar 2024 | Sale A | 2,400 | 68.17 | 163,608 | D |
15 Mar 2024 09:19 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | SCHAEFFER DAVE | CHAIRMAN, CEO, AND PRESIDENT, 10% | 13 Mar 2024 | Sale | 30,000 | 67.52 | 2,025,600 | D |
18 Mar 2024 11:12 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | SCHAEFFER DAVE | CHAIRMAN, CEO, AND PRESIDENT, 10% | 15 Mar 2024 | Sale | 26,174 | 64.21 | 1,680,633 | D |
14 May 2024 16:42 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | SCHAEFFER DAVE | CHAIRMAN, CEO, AND PRESIDENT, 10% | 13 May 2024 | Sale | 50,000 | 59.44 | 2,972,000 | D |
22 May 2024 18:11 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | FERGUSON LEWIS H | Director | 21 May 2024 | Sale | 2,000 | 58.9009 | 117,802 | D |
23 May 2024 16:58 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | KENNEDY SHERYL LYNN | Director | 23 May 2024 | Sale | 1,640 | 57.7939 | 94,782 | D |
04 Jun 2024 16:16 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | BUBECK JAMES | CHIEF REVENUE OFFICER | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 1,920 | 58.9693 | 113,221 | D |
07 Jun 2024 10:16 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | KILMER HENRY W | VP OF NETWORK STRATEGY | 06 Jun 2024 | Sale | 2,400 | 56 | 134,400 | D |
10 Jun 2024 13:50 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | WEED THADDEUS GERARD | VICE PRESIDENT, CFO | 10 Jun 2024 | Sale | 2,400 | 52.605 | 126,252 | D |
11 Jun 2024 16:38 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | MONTAGNER MARC | Director | 11 Jun 2024 | Purchase | 10,000 | 52.613 | 526,130 | D |
13 Jun 2024 11:13 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | SCHAEFFER DAVE | CHAIRMAN, CEO, AND PRESIDENT, 10% | 12 Jun 2024 | Sale | 60,000 | 54.6 | 3,276,000 | D |
17 Jun 2024 10:22 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | SCHAEFFER DAVE | CHAIRMAN, CEO, AND PRESIDENT, 10% | 14 Jun 2024 | Sale | 60,000 | 51.7805 | 3,106,830 | D |
26 Aug 2024 10:10 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | FERGUSON LEWIS H | Director | 22 Aug 2024 | Sale | 1,550 | 72.6155 | 112,554 | D |
26 Aug 2024 16:11 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | CHANG JOHN B. | VP & CHIEF LEGAL OFFICER | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 2,055 | 74 | 152,070 | D |
28 Aug 2024 12:00 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | SCHAEFFER DAVE | CHAIRMAN, CEO, AND PRESIDENT, 10% | 27 Aug 2024 | Sale | 60,000 | 72.816 | 4,368,960 | D |
03 Sep 2024 16:11 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | WEED THADDEUS GERARD | VICE PRESIDENT, CFO | 03 Sep 2024 | Sale | 2,400 | 69.6757 | 167,222 | D |
05 Sep 2024 16:10 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | KILMER HENRY W | VP OF NETWORK STRATEGY | 04 Sep 2024 | Sale | 2,400 | 69.51 | 166,824 | D |
05 Sep 2024 16:44 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | BUBECK JAMES | CHIEF REVENUE OFFICER | 04 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,920 | 69.77 | 133,958 | D |
11 Sep 2024 16:17 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | KENNEDY SHERYL LYNN | Director | 10 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,550 | 71.0573 | 110,139 | D |
11 Sep 2024 16:18 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | SCHAEFFER DAVE | CHAIRMAN, CEO, AND PRESIDENT, 10% | 10 Sep 2024 | Sale | 65,000 | 71.747 | 4,663,555 | D |
13 Sep 2024 16:45 | CCOI | COGENT COMMUNICATIONS HOLDINGS Inc | CHANG JOHN B. | VP & CHIEF LEGAL OFFICER | 12 Sep 2024 | Sale | 1,400 | 71.67 | 100,338 | D |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)