Real Time Insider Transaction Data
Real Time Insider buys and sells Data - Insider Trades - Insider Transactions - Insider Trading Data - SEC Form 4 Data
Total | Transactions | Amount |
Buys | 23694 | $19,696,057,672 |
Sells | 86159 | $219,149,249,205 |
Security | Reporting Name | Relationship | Purchase/Sale | Shares | Price $ | D/I | ||||
16 May 2024 16:25 | YELP | YELP INC | SCHWARZBACH DAVID A | Chief Financial Officer | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 2,750 | 38.07 | 104,692 | D |
20 May 2024 17:50 | YELP | YELP INC | ORR CARMEN | Chief People Officer | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 14,984 | 38.0007 | 569,402 | D |
22 May 2024 17:34 | YELP | YELP INC | EATON SAM | Chief Technology Officer | 22 May 2024 | Sale | 26,718 | 36.6199 | 978,410 | D |
05 Jun 2024 18:11 | YELP | YELP INC | EATON SAM | Chief Technology Officer | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 425 | 36.73 | 15,610 | D |
06 Jun 2024 17:11 | YELP | YELP INC | NACHMAN JOSEPH R | Chief Operating Officer | 04 Jun 2024 | Sale | 4,941 | 36.53 | 180,495 | D |
09 Jul 2024 16:29 | YELP | YELP INC | NACHMAN JOSEPH R | Chief Operating Officer | 05 Jul 2024 | Sale | 7,000 | 36.2364 | 253,655 | D |
07 Aug 2024 16:05 | YELP | YELP INC | NACHMAN JOSEPH R | Chief Operating Officer | 05 Aug 2024 | Sale | 7,000 | 33.2502 | 232,751 | D |
27 Aug 2024 16:48 | YELP | YELP INC | EATON SAM | Chief Technology Officer | 23 Aug 2024 | Sale | 10,776 | 35 | 377,160 | D |
06 Sep 2024 16:02 | YELP | YELP INC | NACHMAN JOSEPH R | Chief Operating Officer | 04 Sep 2024 | Sale | 7,000 | 33.6779 | 235,745 | D |
29 Sep 2023 16:59 | YELP | YELP INC | NACHMAN JOSEPH R | Chief Operating Officer | 27 Sep 2023 | Sale | 6,000 | 42.2989 | 253,793 | D |
18 Oct 2023 18:07 | YELP | YELP INC | SCHWARZBACH DAVID A | Chief Financial Officer | 16 Oct 2023 | Sale | 2,750 | 42.37 | 116,518 | D |
31 Oct 2023 16:13 | YELP | YELP INC | NACHMAN JOSEPH R | Chief Operating Officer | 27 Oct 2023 | Sale | 6,000 | 40.7229 | 244,337 | D |
08 Nov 2023 09:12 | YELP | YELP INC | STOPPELMAN JEREMY | Chief Executive Officer | 03 Nov 2023 | Sale | 10,000 | 45.1 | 451,000 | I |
08 Nov 2023 09:12 | YELP | YELP INC | STOPPELMAN JEREMY | Chief Executive Officer | 06 Nov 2023 | Sale | 10,000 | 45 | 450,000 | I |
08 Nov 2023 09:12 | YELP | YELP INC | STOPPELMAN JEREMY | Chief Executive Officer | 07 Nov 2023 | Sale | 10,000 | 45.12 | 451,200 | I |
15 Nov 2023 16:34 | YELP | YELP INC | ORR CARMEN | Chief People Officer | 13 Nov 2023 | Sale | 4,326 | 43.8319 | 189,617 | D |
16 Nov 2023 16:46 | YELP | YELP INC | STOPPELMAN JEREMY | Chief Executive Officer | 14 Nov 2023 | Sale | 10,000 | 45 | 450,000 | I |
16 Nov 2023 16:46 | YELP | YELP INC | STOPPELMAN JEREMY | Chief Executive Officer | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 10,000 | 45.21 | 452,100 | I |
16 Nov 2023 16:46 | YELP | YELP INC | STOPPELMAN JEREMY | Chief Executive Officer | 16 Nov 2023 | Sale | 3,700 | 45 | 166,500 | I |
17 Nov 2023 16:27 | YELP | YELP INC | SCHWARZBACH DAVID A | Chief Financial Officer | 15 Nov 2023 | Sale | 2,750 | 45.21 | 124,328 | D |
22 Nov 2023 17:55 | YELP | YELP INC | EATON SAM | Chief Technology Officer | 21 Nov 2023 | Sale | 25,402 | 45.7475 | 1,162,078 | D |
22 Nov 2023 17:55 | YELP | YELP INC | EATON SAM | Chief Technology Officer | 22 Nov 2023 | Sale | 10,993 | 45.2425 | 497,351 | D |
22 Nov 2023 17:55 | YELP | YELP INC | EATON SAM | Chief Technology Officer | 22 Nov 2023 | Sale | 19,494 | 45.8861 | 894,504 | D |
22 Nov 2023 17:55 | YELP | YELP INC | EATON SAM | Chief Technology Officer | 22 Nov 2023 | Sale | 1,182 | 46.714 | 55,216 | D |
29 Nov 2023 17:11 | YELP | YELP INC | NACHMAN JOSEPH R | Chief Operating Officer | 27 Nov 2023 | Sale | 6,000 | 45.2859 | 271,715 | D |
19 Dec 2023 16:08 | YELP | YELP INC | SCHWARZBACH DAVID A | Chief Financial Officer | 15 Dec 2023 | Sale | 2,750 | 45.33 | 124,658 | D |
29 Dec 2023 16:35 | YELP | YELP INC | NACHMAN JOSEPH R | Chief Operating Officer | 27 Dec 2023 | Sale | 6,000 | 48.0729 | 288,437 | D |
18 Jan 2024 17:53 | YELP | YELP INC | SCHWARZBACH DAVID A | Chief Financial Officer | 16 Jan 2024 | Sale | 2,750 | 43.4 | 119,350 | D |
30 Jan 2024 16:03 | YELP | YELP INC | NACHMAN JOSEPH R | Chief Operating Officer | 26 Jan 2024 | Sale | 6,000 | 44.7452 | 268,471 | D |
20 Feb 2024 16:17 | YELP | YELP INC | SCHWARZBACH DAVID A | Chief Financial Officer | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 2,750 | 43.63 | 119,982 | D |
27 Feb 2024 16:23 | YELP | YELP INC | NACHMAN JOSEPH R | Chief Operating Officer | 23 Feb 2024 | Sale | 6,000 | 36.0112 | 216,067 | D |
06 Jun 2024 16:32 | XYL | Xylem Inc | AULICK RODNEY | SVP & President, WSS | 05 Jun 2024 | Sale | 21,800 | 139.0086 | 3,030,387 | D |
11 Jun 2024 16:18 | XYL | Xylem Inc | MCSHANE GERI-MICHELLE | VP, Controller & CAO | 10 Jun 2024 | Sale | 2,278 | 138.63 | 315,799 | D |
10 Sep 2024 16:14 | XYL | Xylem Inc | HARKER VICTORIA D | Director | 09 Sep 2024 | Sale | 2,760 | 127.65 | 352,314 | D |
16 Nov 2023 17:22 | XYL | Xylem Inc | DECKER PATRICK | President & CEO | 14 Nov 2023 | Sale | 50,458 | 100.5652 | 5,074,319 | D |
16 Nov 2023 17:22 | XYL | Xylem Inc | DECKER PATRICK | President & CEO | 14 Nov 2023 | Sale | 49,190 | 101.1268 | 4,974,427 | D |
11 Dec 2023 16:00 | XYL | Xylem Inc | HARKER VICTORIA D | Director | 08 Dec 2023 | Sale | 2,000 | 106.495 | 212,990 | D |
12 Feb 2024 17:12 | XYL | Xylem Inc | CERWINKA FRANZ | SVP & Pres, AWS & Bus Trnsform | 08 Feb 2024 | Sale | 2,408 | 121.7916 | 293,274 | D |
12 Feb 2024 17:11 | XYL | Xylem Inc | TOUSSAINT CLAUDIA S | SVP, CPSO | 08 Feb 2024 | Sale | 9,028 | 122.2116 | 1,103,326 | I |
16 Feb 2024 16:38 | XYL | Xylem Inc | BELIVEAU-DUNN JEANNE | Director | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,835 | 124.5075 | 228,471 | D |
16 Feb 2024 16:36 | XYL | Xylem Inc | AULICK RODNEY | SVP & President, WSS | 14 Feb 2024 | Sale | 23,870 | 122.5454 | 2,925,159 | D |
21 Feb 2024 19:10 | XYL | Xylem Inc | MCSHANE GERI-MICHELLE | VP, Controller & CAO | 20 Feb 2024 | Sale | 1,000 | 122.89 | 122,890 | D |
05 Mar 2024 17:01 | XYL | Xylem Inc | CERWINKA FRANZ | SVP & Pres, AWS & Bus Trnsform | 01 Mar 2024 | Sale | 1,341 | 127.44 | 170,897 | D |
05 Mar 2024 17:09 | XYL | Xylem Inc | YARKADAS HAYATI | SVP & President, EU, WI & GLS | 01 Mar 2024 | Sale | 9,698 | 127.14 | 1,233,004 | D |
05 Mar 2024 17:09 | XYL | Xylem Inc | YARKADAS HAYATI | SVP & President, EU, WI & GLS | 01 Mar 2024 | Sale | 5,035 | 127.14 | 640,150 | D |
05 Mar 2024 17:09 | XYL | Xylem Inc | YARKADAS HAYATI | SVP & President, EU, WI & GLS | 01 Mar 2024 | Sale | 4,870 | 127.14 | 619,172 | D |
05 Mar 2024 17:09 | XYL | Xylem Inc | YARKADAS HAYATI | SVP & President, EU, WI & GLS | 01 Mar 2024 | Sale | 4,875 | 127.17 | 619,954 | D |
05 Mar 2024 17:09 | XYL | Xylem Inc | YARKADAS HAYATI | SVP & President, EU, WI & GLS | 05 Mar 2024 | Sale | 4,547 | 127.53 | 579,879 | D |
31 May 2024 16:05 | XXII | 22nd Century Group Inc | FIRESTONE LAWRENCE | Chief Executive Officer | 30 May 2024 | Purchase | 9,000 | 1.0921 | 9,829 | D |
12 Sep 2024 17:00 | XXII | 22nd Century Group Inc | FIRESTONE LAWRENCE | Chief Executive Officer | 12 Sep 2024 | Purchase | 39,000 | 0.2684 | 10,468 | D |
05 Jan 2024 16:32 | XXII | 22nd Century Group Inc | FIRESTONE LAWRENCE | Chief Executive Officer | 04 Jan 2024 | Purchase | 100,000 | 0.1736 | 17,360 | D |
08 Jan 2024 20:04 | XXII | 22nd Century Group Inc | ARNO ANDREW | Director | 05 Jan 2024 | Purchase | 100,000 | 0.1749 | 17,490 | D |
22 Jul 2024 08:47 | XWEL | XWELL Inc | WIZENBERG GAELLE SANDRA | Director | 26 Apr 2024 | Purchase | 100 | 1.83 | 183 | D |
22 Jul 2024 08:47 | XWEL | XWELL Inc | WIZENBERG GAELLE SANDRA | Director | 07 May 2024 | Purchase | 199 | 1.85 | 368 | D |
13 Sep 2024 17:41 | XWEL | XWELL Inc | WIZENBERG GAELLE SANDRA | Director | 11 Sep 2024 | Purchase | 1,201 | 1.6541 | 1,987 | D |
28 Jun 2024 11:48 | XW | CITIZENS FINANCIAL SERVICES INC | LANDY R JOSEPH | Director | 11 Aug 2020 | Purchase | 101 | 47.56 | 4,802 | D |
17 Nov 2023 16:42 | XTNT | Xtant Medical Holdings Inc | BRANDT KEVIN D | Chief Commercial Officer | 17 Nov 2023 | Purchase | 41,670 | 1.196 | 49,837 | D |
14 Mar 2024 20:38 | XTIA | XTI Aerospace Inc | ALI NADIR | Former CEO & Director | 19 Dec 2023 | Sale | 7,243 | 0.06 | 435 | D |
14 Mar 2024 21:31 | XTIA | XTI Aerospace Inc | DAS SOUMYA | Chief Operating Officer | 08 Mar 2024 | Sale | 4,804 | 0.0515 | 247 | D |
29 Sep 2023 06:05 | XRX | Xerox Holdings Corp | ICAHN CARL C | 10% | 28 Sep 2023 | Sale | 34,245,314 | 15.84 | 542,445,774 | I |
03 Jun 2024 16:21 | XRAY | DENTSPLY SIRONA Inc | LUCIER GREGORY T | Director | 31 May 2024 | Purchase | 3,577 | 27.9498 | 99,976 | D |
09 Aug 2024 16:08 | XRAY | DENTSPLY SIRONA Inc | LUCIER GREGORY T | Director | 08 Aug 2024 | Purchase | 8,212 | 24.3525 | 199,983 | D |
20 Nov 2023 16:08 | XRAY | DENTSPLY SIRONA Inc | CAMPION SIMON D | President, CEO & Member of BOD | 20 Nov 2023 | Purchase | 10,000 | 29.7 | 297,000 | D |
20 Nov 2023 16:10 | XRAY | DENTSPLY SIRONA Inc | COLEMAN GLENN | Executive VP & CFO | 20 Nov 2023 | Purchase | 10,000 | 29.7 | 297,000 | D |
27 Nov 2023 16:34 | XRAY | DENTSPLY SIRONA Inc | LUCIER GREGORY T | Director | 22 Nov 2023 | Purchase | 10,000 | 31.44 | 314,400 | D |
16 May 2024 17:57 | XPRO | EXPRO GROUP HOLDINGS N.V. | FANNING QUINN P | Chief Financial Officer | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 15,000 | 21.0503 | 315,754 | D |
16 May 2024 17:57 | XPRO | EXPRO GROUP HOLDINGS N.V. | FANNING QUINN P | Chief Financial Officer | 16 May 2024 | Sale | 2,500 | 21.1164 | 52,791 | D |
22 May 2024 16:31 | XPRO | EXPRO GROUP HOLDINGS N.V. | OAK HILL ADVISORS LP | 10% | 20 May 2024 | Sale | 2,701,920 | 22.25 | 60,117,720 | I |
03 Jun 2024 16:38 | XPRO | EXPRO GROUP HOLDINGS N.V. | WHELLEY EILEEN GOSS | Director | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 2,820 | 21.1336 | 59,597 | D |
03 Jun 2024 16:40 | XPRO | EXPRO GROUP HOLDINGS N.V. | TROE LISA L | Director | 03 Jun 2024 | Sale | 2,820 | 21.1336 | 59,597 | D |
25 Jun 2024 16:20 | XPRO | EXPRO GROUP HOLDINGS N.V. | RUSSELL STEVEN J | Chief Technology Officer | 21 Jun 2024 | Sale | 15,000 | 23.0063 | 345,094 | D |
06 Jun 2024 21:51 | XPON | Expion360 Inc | YOZAMP JOHN HENRY | 10% | 04 Jun 2024 | Sale | 5,273 | 1.67 | 8,806 | D |
06 Jun 2024 21:51 | XPON | Expion360 Inc | YOZAMP JOHN HENRY | 10% | 05 Jun 2024 | Sale | 29,727 | 1.57 | 46,671 | D |
17 Nov 2023 17:01 | XPON | Expion360 Inc | YOZAMP JOHN HENRY | Business Development Officer, 10% | 16 Nov 2023 | Sale | 23,035 | 3.92 | 90,297 | D |
17 Nov 2023 18:07 | XPON | Expion360 Inc | YOZAMP JOHN HENRY | Business Development Officer, 10% | 16 Nov 2023 | Sale A | 23,035 | 3.92 | 90,297 | D |
19 Dec 2023 19:39 | XPON | Expion360 Inc | YOZAMP JOHN HENRY | Business Development Officer, 10% | 18 Dec 2023 | Sale | 23,035 | 4.6 | 105,961 | D |
17 Jan 2024 20:59 | XPON | Expion360 Inc | YOZAMP JOHN HENRY | 10% | 16 Jan 2024 | Sale | 23,035 | 4.72 | 108,725 | D |
16 Sep 2024 20:07 | XPOF | Xponential Fitness Inc | LUNA SARAH | President | 13 Sep 2024 | Sale | 14,400 | 13.8459 | 199,381 | D |
23 Feb 2024 14:03 | XPOF | Xponential Fitness Inc | LUNA SARAH | President | 15 Feb 2024 | Sale | 912 | 10.94 | 9,977 | D |
27 Feb 2024 19:14 | XPOF | Xponential Fitness Inc | GEISLER ANTHONY | Chief Executive Officer, 10% | 27 Feb 2024 | Sale | 17,901 | 9.9256 | 177,678 | D |
27 Feb 2024 19:10 | XPOF | Xponential Fitness Inc | HAGOPIAN ANDREW | Chief Legal Officer | 27 Feb 2024 | Sale | 5,260 | 10.0583 | 52,907 | D |
27 Feb 2024 19:16 | XPOF | Xponential Fitness Inc | LUNA SARAH | President | 27 Feb 2024 | Sale | 5,399 | 10.0148 | 54,070 | D |
27 Feb 2024 19:23 | XPOF | Xponential Fitness Inc | MELOUN JOHN P | Chief Financial Officer | 27 Feb 2024 | Sale | 6,160 | 10.0898 | 62,153 | D |
01 Mar 2024 13:29 | XPOF | Xponential Fitness Inc | HAGOPIAN ANDREW | Chief Legal Officer | 28 Feb 2024 | Sale | 2,405 | 9.6635 | 23,241 | D |
07 Mar 2024 16:23 | XPOF | Xponential Fitness Inc | GEISLER ANTHONY | Chief Executive Officer, 10% | 06 Mar 2024 | Sale | 32,125 | 14.0783 | 452,265 | D |
07 Mar 2024 16:26 | XPOF | Xponential Fitness Inc | MELOUN JOHN P | Chief Financial Officer | 06 Mar 2024 | Sale | 17,310 | 14.0805 | 243,733 | D |
07 Mar 2024 16:29 | XPOF | Xponential Fitness Inc | LUNA SARAH | President | 06 Mar 2024 | Sale | 15,896 | 14.0772 | 223,771 | D |
17 May 2024 17:41 | XPO | XPO Inc | MFN PARTNERS, LP | 10% | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 1,171,238 | 112.85 | 132,174,208 | D |
17 May 2024 17:41 | XPO | XPO Inc | MFN PARTNERS, LP | 10% | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 50,000 | 115.04 | 5,752,000 | D |
17 May 2024 17:41 | XPO | XPO Inc | MFN PARTNERS, LP | 10% | 15 May 2024 | Sale | 28,762 | 114.6 | 3,296,125 | D |
28 May 2024 16:26 | XPO | XPO Inc | LANDRY ALLISON | Director | 23 May 2024 | Sale | 1,875 | 104.52 | 195,975 | D |
08 Nov 2023 07:53 | XPO | XPO Inc | FRYE J WES | Director | 06 Nov 2023 | Purchase | 1,500 | 79.71 | 119,565 | D |
03 Jan 2024 16:21 | XPO | XPO Inc | HARIK MARIO A | Chief Executive Officer | 31 Dec 2023 | Sale | 9,383 | 87.59 | 821,857 | D |
05 Apr 2024 11:37 | XPL | SOLITARIO RESOURCES Corp | HESKETH JAMES KB | Director | 04 Apr 2024 | Sale | 4,900 | 0.72 | 3,528 | D |
24 Oct 2023 12:20 | XPL | SOLITARIO RESOURCES Corp | HESKETH JAMES KB | Director | 20 Oct 2023 | Purchase | 63,500 | 0.31 | 19,685 | D |
23 Aug 2024 17:16 | XPER | Xperi Inc | HABIGER DAVID C | Director | 21 Aug 2024 | Purchase | 5,750 | 8.6755 | 49,884 | D |
26 Aug 2024 17:36 | XPER | Xperi Inc | ANTONELLIS DARCY | Director | 22 Aug 2024 | Purchase | 10,500 | 8.55 | 89,775 | D |
26 Aug 2024 19:47 | XPER | Xperi Inc | HABIGER DAVID C | Director | 22 Aug 2024 | Purchase | 5,775 | 8.6035 | 49,685 | D |
27 Aug 2024 16:38 | XPER | Xperi Inc | MARQUEZ REBECCA | CLO and Secretary | 23 Aug 2024 | Purchase | 1,150 | 8.62 | 9,913 | D |
03 Sep 2024 19:11 | XPER | Xperi Inc | ANDERSEN ROBERT J | Chief Financial Officer | 30 Aug 2024 | Purchase | 1,700 | 8.75 | 14,875 | D |
* D/I = Direct / Indirect
* 10% = Entity with 10% or higher ownership stake
* A = Amendment Filing (SEC Form 4/A)